Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Enea Selis

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cosenza e Bisignano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1910BornBonorva
24 Sep 193827.8Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jan 196453.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Iglesias, Italy
18 Jan 196453.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Mauretania
19 Mar 196453.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Mauretania
196958.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
2 Sep 197160.8AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
4 Apr 197968.4AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza e Bisignano, Italy
30 Oct 197968.9ResignedArchbishop of Cosenza e Bisignano, Italy
14 Dec 199989.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cosenza e Bisignano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Enea Selis:
Archbishop Enea Selis (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cosenza e Bisignano

  • a priest for 61.2 years
  • a bishop for 35.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013