Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gaspare Ricciullo del Fosso, O.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1496Born
Nov 1521³25.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Minims
17 May 154852.3AppointedBishop of Scala, Italy
22 Apr 155155.2AppointedBishop of Calvi Risorta, Italy
17 Jul 156064.5AppointedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
28 Dec 159296.9DiedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaspare Ricciullo del Fosso (VIAF: 64220891)
Archbishop Gaspare Ricciullo del Fosso O.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Reggio Calabria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRogliano, Archdiocese of Cosenza
Death PlaceReggio Calabria, Archdiocese of Reggio Calabria

  • a priest for 71.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 284, and Page 148
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 294
  • bd/op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1548, Number 16*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast