Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Catanzaro-Squillace

Archidioecesis Catacensis-Squillacensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Vincenzo Bertolone, S.d.P., Archbishop
  • Antonio Cantisani, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Antonio Ciliberti, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • United: 30 September 1986
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 1,806 (697 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Calabria
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesicatanzarosquillace.it/
  • Mailing Address: Via dell'Arcivescovado 13, 88100 Catanzaro, Italia
  • Telephone: 0961.72.13.35
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Catanzaro
1121ErectedDiocese of Catanzaro (erected)
Archdiocese of Catanzaro
5 June 1927ElevatedDiocese of Catanzaro Archdiocese of Catanzaro
Archdiocese of Catanzaro-Squillace
30 September 1986UnitedArchdiocese of Catanzaro
Diocese of Squillace
Archdiocese of Catanzaro-Squillace
30 January 2001ElevatedArchdiocese of Catanzaro-Squillace (became a Metroplitan)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Catanzaro
195095,75095,95699.8%6215771,2432113046ap1951
1959110,500111,50099.1%6421851,3001759746ap1960
1969139,476139,75599.8%6627931,4993420145ap1971
1980135,700139,30097.4%73371101,2334320456ap1981
Archdiocese of Catanzaro-Squillace
1990270,000274,50098.4%125611861,4515122255128ap1991
1999244,557248,06798.6%124581821,3431686205120ap2000
2000242,246246,42698.3%126521781,3601977205121ap2001
2001245,313249,42698.4%135601951,2581985205121ap2002
2002245,326249,42698.4%139521911,2841978193122ap2003
2003245,326249,42698.4%140521921,2771977208122ap2004
2004245,326249,42698.4%136551911,2841882196122ap2005
2006199,000237,00084.0%139541931,0311977179122ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014