Bishop(s)
|
General Information
|
Date | Event | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
5th Century | Erected | Diocese of Cassano all’Jonio (erected) | |
13 February 1919 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Cassano all’Jonio
Archdiocese of Rossano Diocese of San Marco e Bisignano | Eparchy of Lungro degli Italo-Albanesi (Italo-Albanese) (erected) |
8 September 1976 | Territory Added | Diocese of Anglona-Tursi (Alessandria del Garretto, Amendolara, Canna, Montegiordano, Nocara, Oriolo, Rocca Imperiale, and Rosito Capo Spulico) | Diocese of Cassano all’Jonio |
4 April 1979 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Cassano all’Jonio (Scalea, Aieta, Orsomarso, Papasidero, Praia a Mare, San Nicola Arcella, Santa Domenica Taleo, Santa Maria del Cedro, Tortora, and Verbicaro) | Diocese of San Marco Argentano-Scalea |
30 January 2001 | Metropolitan Changed | Diocese of Cassano all’Jonio (from Reggio Calabria-Bova) |
Year | Catholics | Total Population | Percent Catholic | Diocesan Priests | Religious Priests | Total Priests | Catholics Per Priest | Permanent Deacons | Male Religious | Female Religious | Parishes | Source |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1886 | 116,081 | .0% | 370 | 0 | 49 | OTC | ||||||
1950 | 110,000 | 110,000 | 100.0% | 83 | 6 | 89 | 1,235 | 6 | 106 | 45 | ap1951 | |
1958 | 110,000 | 110,000 | 100.0% | 73 | 15 | 88 | 1,250 | 15 | 118 | 51 | ap1960 | |
1970 | 130,060 | 130,060 | 100.0% | 68 | 11 | 79 | 1,646 | 14 | 138 | 54 | ap1971 | |
1980 | 98,000 | 102,000 | 96.1% | 52 | 16 | 68 | 1,441 | 16 | 84 | 43 | ap1981 | |
1990 | 104,000 | 106,000 | 98.1% | 51 | 14 | 65 | 1,600 | 14 | 102 | 46 | ap1991 | |
1999 | 104,200 | 106,400 | 97.9% | 62 | 8 | 70 | 1,488 | 3 | 14 | 88 | 48 | ap2000 |
2000 | 104,200 | 107,000 | 97.4% | 61 | 7 | 68 | 1,532 | 3 | 9 | 70 | 47 | ap2001 |
2001 | 104,000 | 106,000 | 98.1% | 67 | 8 | 75 | 1,386 | 3 | 10 | 75 | 47 | ap2002 |
2002 | 104,200 | 106,580 | 97.8% | 61 | 8 | 69 | 1,510 | 3 | 10 | 75 | 47 | ap2003 |
2003 | 104,000 | 106,200 | 97.9% | 59 | 8 | 67 | 1,552 | 3 | 10 | 57 | 47 | ap2004 |
2004 | 104,200 | 106,800 | 97.6% | 61 | 8 | 69 | 1,510 | 3 | 15 | 74 | 47 | ap2005 |
2006 | 105,000 | 106,600 | 98.5% | 61 | 7 | 68 | 1,544 | 3 | 9 | 60 | 47 | ap2007 |
2013 | 104,187 | 108,100 | 96.4% | 65 | 13 | 78 | 1,335 | 3 | 15 | 59 | 49 | ap2014 |
2016 | 103,761 | 107,881 | 96.2% | 65 | 10 | 75 | 1,383 | 3 | 12 | 46 | 52 | ap2017 |
2019 | 102,670 | 107,323 | 95.7% | 60 | 10 | 70 | 1,466 | 7 | 12 | 40 | 52 | ap2020 |
2021 | 102,100 | 107,000 | 95.4% | 58 | 10 | 68 | 1,501 | 8 | 12 | 23 | 52 | ap2022 |
Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 11 Feb 2024 |
✠