Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Raffaele Mormile, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Palermo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1744Born
19 Sep 176723.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
16 Dec 179147.3SelectedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
27 Feb 179247.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
4 Mar 179247.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
28 Mar 180358.6AppointedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
13 Dec 181369.3DiedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Mormile
Archbishop Raffaele Mormile C.R. (born , died ) Archbishop of Palermo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 191
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 298
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast