Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francisco Cardinal de Borja

Deceased

Archbishop of Cosenza

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1441BornJŠtiva
19 Aug 149554.6AppointedBishop of Teano, Italy
6 Nov 149958.8AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
28 Sep 150059.7Elevated to Cardinal
5 Oct 150059.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
11 Aug 150665.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
5 Jun 150867.4ResignedBishop of Teano, Italy
4 Nov 151170.8DiedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Borja:
Cardinal Francisco de Borja (died ) Archbishop of Cosenza

  • a cardinal for 11.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 28 Sep 1500
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 311, and Page 183

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013