Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augusto Lauro

Bishop Emeritus of San Marco Argentano-Scalea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1923 BornTarvisio
29 Jun 194723.5Ordained PriestPriest
8 Sep 197551.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cosenza, Italy
8 Sep 197551.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Bigastro
28 Oct 197551.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bigastro
7 Apr 197955.3AppointedBishop of San Marco Argentano-Scalea, Italy
6 Mar 199975.2RetiredBishop of San Marco Argentano-Scalea, Italy

MicroData Summary for Augusto Lauro:
Bishop Augusto Lauro (born ) Bishop Emeritus of San Marco Argentano-Scalea

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Marco Argentano-Scalea.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015