Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Lanza

Deceased

Archbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy

Bishop of Bova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1905Born
16 Apr 192722.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 May 194338.1AppointedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
12 May 194338.1AppointedBishop of Bova, Italy
29 Jun 194338.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
23 Jun 195045.2DiedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Lanza
Archbishop Antonio Lanza (born , died ) Archbishop of Reggio Calabria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastiglione Cosentino

  • a priest for 23.1 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,947
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,943, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast