Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrea Brancaccio, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Cosenza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1644¹Born
13 Jan 168137.0AppointedBishop of Conversano, Italy
26 Jan 168137.0Ordained BishopBishop of Conversano, Italy
18 Apr 170157.2AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
4 Jun 172581.4DiedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrea Brancaccio
Archbishop Andrea Brancaccio C.R. (born 1644, died ) Archbishop of Cosenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a bishop for 44.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 171, and Page 179
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1681, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast