Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Domenico Cardinal del Carretto

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cahors, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia

Apostolic Nuncio to France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Dec 1454²Born
24 Apr 148934.3AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
10 Oct 149136.8AppointedAdministrator of Angers, France
15 May 149944.4ResignedAdministrator of Angers, France
16 Aug 149944.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thebae
1503²48.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
1 Dec 150551.0Elevated to Cardinal
17 Dec 150551.0InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
4 Jan 150752.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Nicola in Carcere
16 Sep 150752.7AppointedArchbishop of Reims, France
5 Apr 150954.3AppointedArchbishop of Tours, France
Jun 1513²58.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
3 Jul 151459.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Cahors, France
12 Aug 151459.6ResignedBishop of Cahors, France
15 Aug 151459.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Cahors, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Domenico del Carretto
Carlo Domenico Cardinal del Carretto (born Dec 1454, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cahors

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenoa, Archdiocese of Genova, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Cecilia, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 8.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Dec 1505
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 160
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 249

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 8 Jan 2019

Quantcast