Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Antonio Cavalcanti, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Cosenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1695BornCaccuri
171115.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
17 Dec 171823.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
20 May 174347.6AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
2 Jun 174347.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
7 Jan 174852.2DiedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Antonio Cavalcanti:
Archbishop Francesco Antonio Cavalcanti C.R. (born , died ) Archbishop of Cosenza

  • a priest for 29.1 years
  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 288
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013