Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Flavio Cardinal Orsini

Deceased

Bishop of Spoleto

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1532²BornRome
29 Nov 156028.9AppointedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
15 Mar 156129.2Ordained BishopBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
6 Jul 156230.5ResignedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
16 Dec 156231.0AppointedBishop of Spoleto, Italy
12 Mar 156533.2Elevated to Cardinal
15 May 156533.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
17 Nov 156533.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
24 Jan 156937.1AppointedAdministrator of Cosenza, Italy
16 Sep 157341.7ResignedAdministrator of Cosenza, Italy
9 Jul 157846.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
16 May 158149.4DiedBishop of Spoleto, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Flavio Orsini:
Cardinal Flavio Orsini (died ) Bishop of Spoleto

  • a bishop for 20.2 years
  • a cardinal for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Mar 1565
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 303, and Page 183
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 251
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,561

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013