Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre d’Aigrefeuille

Deceased

Bishop of Avignon, France


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Feb 1347AppointedBishop of Tulle, France
24 Oct 1347AppointedBishop of Vabres, France
18 Feb 1349AppointedBishop of Clermont, France
8 Feb 1357AppointedBishop of Uzés, France
11 Aug 1366AppointedBishop of Mende, France
11 Oct 1368AppointedBishop of Avignon, France
16 Jun 1371DiedBishop of Avignon, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre d’Aigrefeuille
Bishop Pierre d’Aigrefeuille (died ) Bishop of Avignon

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 505, and Page 511
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 192, and Page 342
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 124

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 8 Apr 2020

Quantcast