Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Projectus Machebeuf (Macheboeuf)

Deceased

Bishop of Denver, Colorado


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1812BornRiom, France
21 Dec 183624.4Ordained PriestPriest of Clermont, France
3 Mar 186855.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Colorado and Utah, USA
3 Mar 186855.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Epiphania in Cilicia
16 Aug 186856.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Epiphania in Cilicia
16 Aug 188775.0AppointedBishop of Denver, Colorado, USA
10 Jul 188976.9DiedBishop of Denver, Colorado, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Projectus Machebeuf (Macheboeuf):
Bishop Joseph Projectus Machebeuf (Macheboeuf) (born , died ) Bishop of Denver

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 241, and Page 261

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013