Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges Colomb, M.E.P.

Bishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1953 Born
13 Sep 198734.2Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
9 Jul 201057.0AppointedSuperior General of La Société des Missions Etrangères
9 Mar 201662.7AppointedBishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France
5 May 201662.8Ordained BishopBishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France

MicroData Summary for Georges Colomb
Bishop Georges Colomb M.E.P. (born ) Bishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Anthème

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of La Rochelle (-Saintes).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Mar 2016
  • ob/c2: CB, 9 Mar 2016
  • c3+: CB, 7 Apr 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,905

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast