Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Antoine-Henri Du Valk de Dampierre

Deceased

Bishop of Clermont


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1746BornHans
12 Apr 180255.7SelectedBishop of Clermont, France
14 Apr 180255.7ConfirmedBishop of Clermont, France
2 May 180255.7Ordained BishopBishop of Clermont, France
8 Jun 183386.8DiedBishop of Clermont, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Antoine-Henri Du Valk de Dampierre:
Bishop Charles-Antoine-Henri Du Valk de Dampierre (born , died ) Bishop of Clermont

  • a bishop for 31.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 153

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013