Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bernardo Cardinal Salviati

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Papoul, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1508²Born
5 Jun 154941.4AppointedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
26 Feb 156153.1Elevated to Cardinal
27 Jun 156153.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Simeone Profeta
8 Aug 156153.6ResignedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
8 Aug 156153.6AppointedAdministrator of Clermont, France
15 May 156658.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
10 Mar 156860.1ResignedAdministrator of Clermont, France
6 May 156860.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint-Papoul, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Salviati (VIAF: 43013371)
Bernardo Cardinal Salviati (born 1508, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Papoul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
Death PlaceResidence in Trastevere, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria sopra Minerva, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 7.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Feb 1561
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 270, and Page 170
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1549, Number 20*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast