Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. Louis Gabriel Taurin Dufresse, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan, Szechwan, Sichuan), China

Titular Bishop of Thabraca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1750Born
177423.0ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
17 Sep 177423.7Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
24 Jul 179847.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan, Szechwan, Sichuan), China
24 Jul 179847.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Thabraca
25 Jul 180049.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thabraca
15 Nov 180150.9SucceededVicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan, Szechwan, Sichuan), China
14 Sep 181564.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan, Szechwan, Sichuan), China
27 May 1900Beatified
1 Oct 2000Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Louis Gabriel Taurin Dufresse
Bishop St. Louis Gabriel Taurin Dufresse M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Se-Ciuen (Setchoan, Szechwan, Sichuan)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLezoux, Diocese of Clermont, France
Ordained BishopTchentu
Death PlaceChengdu

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1800, Number 7
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 31 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast