Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Saint-Flour

Dioecesis Sancti Flori



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 20 February 1317
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Clermont
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 5,726 (2,211 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Midi
  • Official Web Site: http://catholique-saint-flour.cef.fr/
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, B.P. 20, 3 rue de la Frauze, 15103 Saint-Flour CEDEX, France
  • Telephone: 4.71.60.61.90
  • Fax: 4.71.60.02.49

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
20 February 1317ErectedDiocese of Clermont Diocese of Saint-Flour (erected)
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Rodez (suppressed) Diocese of Cahors
Diocese of Saint-Flour
6 October 1822Territory LostDiocese of Saint-Flour Diocese of Le Puy-en-Velay
8 December 2002Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Saint-Flour (from Bourges)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1949190,888190,888100.0%3326039248660580317ap1951
1970167,000168,81498.9%261326463210495258ap1971
1980166,000168,00098.8%20742117869319302ap1981
1990160,000172,00093.0%16413177903215265302ap1991
1999149,000158,72293.9%145715298047190302ap2000
2000145,000150,56396.3%141714897949168302ap2001
2001145,000150,56396.3%12971361,066410179302ap2002
2002145,000150,56396.3%837901,611310164321ap2003
2003145,000150,56396.3%11451191,21847164321ap2004
2004145,000150,77896.2%120101301,115514165263ap2005
2010137,300157,00087.5%778851,615814137161ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 12 Jun 2013