Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Rose

Deceased

Bishop of Clermont


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1575²BornChaumont, Haute Marne
12 Nov 160126.8AppointedBishop of Senlis, France
25 Nov 160126.8Ordained BishopBishop of Senlis, France
1 Mar 161035.1AppointedBishop of Clermont, France
31 Jan 161439.0DiedBishop of Clermont, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoine Rose:
Bishop Antoine Rose (born 1575, died ) Bishop of Clermont

  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 316, and Page 153
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1601, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015