Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Benoit-Marius Bonnefoux, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Superior Emeritus of Cunčne, Angola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1861Born
9 Nov 188423.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
19 Sep 190443.0AppointedSuperior of Cunčne, Angola
1937²75.3DiedSuperior Emeritus of Cunčne, Angola

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benoit-Marius Bonnefoux (VIAF: 1704869)
Father Benoit-Marius Bonnefoux C.S.Sp. (born , died 1937) Superior Emeritus of Cunčne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceViverols, France

  • a priest for 52.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,932

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast