Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilbert de Vény d’Arbouze

Deceased

Bishop of Clermont


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1608BornVillemont de Vensat
11 Aug 166456.6AppointedBishop of Clermont, France
21 Sep 166456.7Ordained BishopBishop of Clermont, France
19 Apr 168274.3DiedBishop of Clermont, France

MicroData Summary for Gilbert de Vény d’Arbouze:
Bishop Gilbert de Vény d’Arbouze (born , died ) Bishop of Clermont

  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: CB, 21 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 21 Dec 2013