Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joachim d’Estaing

Deceased

Bishop of Clermont, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1589¹Born
12 Jan 161526.0AppointedBishop of Clermont, France
31 May 161526.4Ordained BishopBishop of Clermont, France
11 Sep 165061.6DiedBishop of Clermont, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joachim d’Estaing
Bishop Joachim d’Estaing (born 1589, died ) Bishop of Clermont

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEstaing

  • a bishop for 35.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 153
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1615, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast