Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierre Cardinal Giraud

Deceased

Archbishop of Cambrai

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1791BornMontferrand
23 Sep 181524.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jan 183038.4SelectedBishop of Rodez, France
5 Jul 183038.9ConfirmedBishop of Rodez, France
30 Nov 183039.3Ordained BishopBishop of Rodez, France
4 Dec 184150.3SelectedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
24 Jan 184250.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
11 Jun 184755.8Elevated to Cardinal
4 Oct 184756.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace
17 Apr 185058.7DiedArchbishop of Cambrai, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre Giraud:
Cardinal Pierre Giraud (born , died ) Archbishop of Cambrai

  • a priest for 34.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
  • a cardinal for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 50
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 129, and Page 328

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013