Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Félix Couturier, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Alexandria in Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1876Born
20 Sep 190125.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
9 Apr 191943.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Myriophytos
27 Apr 191943.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Myriophytos
30 Apr 191943.0AppointedOfficial of Egitto, Egypt
28 Jun 192145.2AppointedBishop of Alexandria in Ontario, Canada
27 Jul 194165.3DiedBishop of Alexandria in Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Félix Couturier
Bishop Félix Couturier O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Alexandria in Ontario

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Forie, France

  • a priest for 39.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 45
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1919, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast