Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Gouge

Deceased

Bishop of Clermont


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Dec 1407AppointedBishop of Luçon, France
10 Mar 1408AppointedBishop of Chartres, France
10 Jun 1408Ordained BishopBishop of Chartres, France
15 May 1415AppointedBishop of Clermont, France
25 Nov 1444DiedBishop of Clermont, France

MicroData Summary for Martin Gouge:
Bishop Martin Gouge (died ) Bishop of Clermont

  • a bishop for 36.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 167, and Page 192
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 315
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,115

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013