Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Du Prat

Deceased

Bishop of Clermont, France


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Jun 1517AppointedBishop of Clermont, France
6 Dec 1517Ordained BishopBishop of Clermont, France
19 Nov 1528DiedBishop of Clermont, France

MicroData Summary for Thomas Du Prat
Bishop Thomas Du Prat (died ) Bishop of Clermont

  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,319
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 169

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast