Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Baptist Lamy

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Santa Fe, New Mexico

Titular Archbishop of Cyzicus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1814BornLempdes, France
22 Dec 183824.2Ordained PriestPriest of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
19 Jul 185035.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of New Mexico, USA
19 Jul 185035.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Agathonice
24 Nov 185036.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Agathonice
29 Jul 185338.8AppointedBishop of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA
12 Feb 187560.3AppointedArchbishop of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA
19 Jul 1885³70.8ResignedArchbishop of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA
18 Aug 188570.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cyzicus
13 Feb 188873.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Lamy:
Archbishop John Baptist Lamy (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Santa Fe

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 37.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 80, and Page 237
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 271

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013