Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Bonal (d’Aujac)

Deceased

Bishop of Clermont, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1734Born
23 Jun 177642.1SelectedBishop of Clermont, France
16 Sep 177642.3ConfirmedBishop of Clermont, France
6 Oct 177642.4Ordained BishopBishop of Clermont, France
3 Sep 180066.3DiedBishop of Clermont, France

MicroData Summary for François de Bonal (d’Aujac) (VIAF: 59111151)
Bishop François de Bonal (d’Aujac) (born , died ) Bishop of Clermont

EventPlace
Birth PlacePenne d’Agenais

  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1776, Number 39
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 169

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast