Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Massillon, C.O.I. †

Deceased

Bishop of Clermont


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1663BornHières
22 Sep 169128.2Ordained PriestPriest of Société de l’Oratoire de Jésus
12 Nov 171754.3SelectedBishop of Clermont, France
14 Nov 171855.3ConfirmedBishop of Clermont, France
21 Dec 171855.4Ordained BishopBishop of Clermont, France
29 May 171955.9InstalledBishop of Clermont, France
28 Sep 174279.2DiedBishop of Clermont, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Massillon:
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Massillon C.O.I. (born , died ) Bishop of Clermont

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 161
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015