Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emile-Jean-François Thiénard

Deceased

Bishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1873Born
3 Nov 189522.5Ordained PriestPriest
24 Mar 192450.9AppointedBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
1 May 192451.0Ordained BishopBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
26 Oct 194572.5DiedBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria

MicroData Summary for Emile-Jean-François Thiénard
Bishop Emile-Jean-François Thiénard (born , died ) Bishop of Constantine (-Hippone)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRavel-Salmeranges, France

  • a priest for 49.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast