Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel-Emmanuel-Joseph Piguet

Deceased

Bishop of Clermont


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1887BornMâcon
2 Jul 191023.4Ordained PriestPriest
7 Dec 193346.8AppointedBishop of Clermont, France
27 Feb 193447.0Ordained BishopBishop of Clermont, France
3 Jul 195265.4DiedBishop of Clermont, France

MicroData Summary for Gabriel-Emmanuel-Joseph Piguet:
Bishop Gabriel-Emmanuel-Joseph Piguet (born , died ) Bishop of Clermont

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013