Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Marie Le Maistre de La Garlaye

Deceased

Bishop of Clermont


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1700BornDerval
1725¹24.1Ordained PriestPriest
30 Oct 174241.9SelectedBishop of Clermont, France
28 Jan 174342.1ConfirmedBishop of Clermont, France
24 Feb 174342.2Ordained BishopBishop of Clermont, France
5 Jun 177675.5DiedBishop of Clermont, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François-Marie Le Maistre de La Garlaye:
Bishop François-Marie Le Maistre de La Garlaye (born , died ) Bishop of Clermont

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 10
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 169

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015