Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Peter Bourgade (Bougarde)

Deceased

Archbishop of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1845Born
30 Nov 186924.1Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jan 188539.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Arizona, USA
7 Feb 188539.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Thaumacus
1 May 188539.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thaumacus
10 May 189751.5AppointedBishop of Tucson, Arizona, USA
7 Jan 189953.2AppointedArchbishop of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA
Apr 189953.4InstalledArchbishop of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA
17 May 190862.5DiedArchbishop of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA

MicroData Summary for Peter Bourgade (Bougarde)
Archbishop Peter Bourgade (Bougarde) (born , died ) Archbishop of Santa Fe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVollore-Ville, France
Ordained BishopCathedral, Santa Fe, Archdiocese of Santa Fe, New Mexico

  • a priest for 38.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 271, and Page 544
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 570
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast