Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo-Tommaso Pirattoni, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Albenga, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1764Born
23 Dec 178622.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
24 Oct 183167.6SelectedBishop of Albenga, Italy
24 Feb 183267.9ConfirmedBishop of Albenga, Italy
26 Feb 183267.9Ordained BishopBishop of Albenga, Italy
25 Oct 183975.6DiedBishop of Albenga, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo-Tommaso Pirattoni
Bishop Vincenzo-Tommaso Pirattoni O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Albenga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlessandria

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1834
  • ob/c2+: CB, 8 Apr 2012
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 66
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1832, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast