Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Buenaventura Cano y Torrente, O. de M. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Magydus

Vicar General of Order of Our Lady of Mercy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1779BornLa Ņora, Spain
17 Dec 180324.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
29 Jul 183354.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Magydus
16 Feb 183454.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Magydus
1835²55.4AppointedVicar General of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
4 Aug 183859.0DiedTitular Bishop of Magydus

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Buenaventura Cano y Torrente:
Bishop Buenaventura Cano y Torrente O. de M. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Magydus

  • a priest for 34.6 years
  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 249
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1700, Page 149, Number 817

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 9 Mar 2015