Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Antonio Visocchi

Deceased

Bishop of Gallipoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1766³Born
4 Mar 179225.6Ordained PriestPriest
21 Mar 183265.6SelectedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
2 Jul 183265.9ConfirmedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
8 Jul 183265.9Ordained BishopBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
20 Apr 183366.7DiedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Antonio Visocchi
Bishop Francesco Antonio Visocchi (born , died ) Bishop of Gallipoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAtina

  • a priest for 41.1 years
  • a bishop for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 201
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1832, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast