Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raffaello de Ghantuz Cubbe

Deceased

Bishop of Livorno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1772³BornAleppo, Syria
9 Mar 179926.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 May 179926.7Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 183461.8AppointedBishop of Livorno, Italy
30 Jun 183461.8Ordained BishopBishop of Livorno, Italy
2 Dec 184068.2DiedBishop of Livorno, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raffaello de Ghantuz Cubbe
Bishop Raffaello de Ghantuz Cubbe (born , died ) Bishop of Livorno

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 341
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 238
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1834, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 9 Aug 2016