Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro di Benedetto

Deceased

Archbishop of Reggio Calabria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1768BornCassano
24 Sep 179123.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Apr 183667.6SelectedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
11 Jul 183667.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
16 Jul 183667.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
25 Feb 185586.4DiedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro di Benedetto:
Archbishop Pietro di Benedetto (born , died ) Archbishop of Reggio Calabria

  • a priest for 63.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 321

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013