Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaetano Balletti

Deceased

Bishop of Cervia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1779Born
14 Jun 180122.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
13 Mar 180222.7Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 183858.6AppointedBishop of Cervia, Italy
18 Feb 183858.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cervia, Italy
11 May 184262.9DiedBishop of Cervia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Balletti
Bishop Gaetano Balletti (born , died ) Bishop of Cervia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFerrara

  • a priest for 40.1 years
  • a bishop for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1842
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 146
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1838, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast