Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Barone

Deceased

Bishop of Capaccio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1773Born
7 Apr 179824.5Ordained PriestPriest
18 Nov 183461.2SelectedBishop of Capaccio, Italy
6 Apr 183561.5ConfirmedBishop of Capaccio, Italy
20 Apr 183561.6Ordained BishopBishop of Capaccio, Italy
7 Oct 184269.0DiedBishop of Capaccio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Barone
Bishop Michele Barone (born , died ) Bishop of Capaccio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSicignano

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 132
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1835, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast