Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Saverio Grimaldi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Severino (Marche)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1785BornTreja
11 Jun 180822.5Ordained PriestPriest
13 Sep 183852.7AppointedBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy
23 Sep 183852.8Ordained BishopBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy
1 Dec 184661.0ResignedBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy
28 Jan 186175.1DiedBishop Emeritus of San Severino (Marche), Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Saverio Grimaldi
Bishop Filippo Saverio Grimaldi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Severino (Marche)

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 516
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 344
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1838, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Aug 2016