Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mariano Brasca Bartocci

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Amelia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1777Born
20 Sep 180023.5Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jul 183659.3AppointedBishop of Amelia, Italy
16 Jul 183659.3Ordained BishopBishop of Amelia, Italy
12 Nov 185073.7ResignedBishop of Amelia, Italy
27 Feb 186083.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Amelia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mariano Brasca Bartocci (VIAF: 304913851)
Bishop Mariano Brasca Bartocci (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Amelia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSant'Anatolia

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,851
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 71
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,836, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast