Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Maria Cardinal Cadolini, B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1771Born
19 Apr 179422.7Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
19 Apr 182250.7AppointedBishop of Cesena, Italy
21 Apr 182250.7Ordained BishopBishop of Cesena, Italy
12 Feb 183866.5AppointedBishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy
19 Jun 184371.9Elevated to Cardinal
22 Jun 184371.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
1 Aug 185180.0DiedBishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Cadolini (VIAF: 88601536)
Antonio Maria Cardinal Cadolini B. (born , died ) Bishop of Ancona e Numana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAncona

  • a priest for 57.2 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
  • a cardinal for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 73, and Page 124
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1822, Number 9
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Jun 1843

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast