Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelico Méstria, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ugento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1760BornFerrandina
6 Mar 178424.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
25 Nov 182767.8SelectedBishop of Ugento, Italy
28 Jan 182868.0ConfirmedBishop of Ugento, Italy
3 Feb 182868.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ugento, Italy
30 Dec 183676.9DiedBishop of Ugento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelico Méstria:
Bishop Angelico Méstria O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Ugento

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 383

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013