Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Saggioli

Deceased

Bishop of Montepulciano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1781Born
25 Feb 180423.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 183453.3AppointedBishop of Montepulciano, Italy
30 Jun 183453.3Ordained BishopBishop of Montepulciano, Italy
19 Feb 1839³57.9DiedBishop of Montepulciano, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Saggioli (VIAF: 89429644)
Bishop Pietro Saggioli (born , died ) Bishop of Montepulciano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGavinana

  • a priest for 34.9 years
  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 271
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,834, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast