Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinando Matteo Maurizio Bruno di Tournafort

Deceased

Bishop of Fossano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1799Born
1 Jun 182222.6Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 183536.0SelectedBishop of Fossano, Italy
1 Feb 183636.3ConfirmedBishop of Fossano, Italy
14 Feb 183636.3Ordained BishopBishop of Fossano, Italy
27 Sep 184849.0DiedBishop of Fossano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando Matteo Maurizio Bruno di Tournafort
Bishop Ferdinando Matteo Maurizio Bruno di Tournafort (born , died ) Bishop of Fossano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorino

  • a priest for 26.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,837
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 198
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,836, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast