Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ferdinando Maria Cardinal Pignatelli, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Palermo

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Vittoria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1770BornNapoli
25 May 179323.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
3 Feb 183968.7SelectedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
21 Feb 183968.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
1 Apr 183968.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
8 Jul 183969.1Elevated to Cardinal
8 Jul 183969.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Vittoria
10 May 185382.9DiedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando Maria Pignatelli:
Cardinal Ferdinando Maria Pignatelli C.R. (born , died ) Archbishop of Palermo

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
  • a cardinal for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 298

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013