Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Crisostomo Dondini, C.R.L. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Urbino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1765Born
20 Sep 178823.1Ordained PriestPriest of Canons Regular of the Congregation of the Most Holy Saviour of the Lateran
21 May 182761.8AppointedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
3 Jun 182761.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
10 Nov 183267.3DiedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Crisostomo Dondini (VIAF: 88905288)
Archbishop Giovanni Crisostomo Dondini C.R.L. (born , died ) Archbishop of Urbino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCento

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 384
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1827, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast