Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giacomo Luigi Cardinal Brignole

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of the Index

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1797Born
2 Feb 183032.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
15 Mar 183032.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus
28 Mar 183032.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus
10 Feb 183335.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
20 Jan 183436.6Elevated to Cardinal
23 Jun 183437.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
13 Sep 183841.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
11 Jun 184750.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
1849²51.6AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Index
23 Jun 185356.1DiedPrefect of the Congregation of the Index

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Luigi Brignole (VIAF: 89064029)
Giacomo Luigi Cardinal Brignole (born , died ) Prefect of Index

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenoa, Archdiocese of Genova {Genoa}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 23.2 years
  • a cardinal for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 45
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 278
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1830, Number 9
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Jan 1834
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 122

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast